VA SB104 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; partial tuition waiver for dependent children of faculty. Requires public institutions of higher education to grant a 50 percent tuition waiver to dependent students of current full-time faculty members who have been employed full time by any one or more public Virginia colleges or universities for an aggregate period of at least seven years if sufficient funds are available in the Dependent Children of University and College Faculty Reduced Tuition Fund. The waiver would be valid at any public institution of higher education. The bill is contingent upon an appropriation of General Funds effectuating the provisions of the bill.
Title
Dependent Children of University and College Faculty Reduced Tuition Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-03-05 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB104S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105129D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105129D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100593D |