VA SB1031 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; certain leasehold interests. Authorizes localities to exempt from real property tax the leasehold interest in property in which the lessor is exempt from real property tax and the lessee is entitled to federal rehabilitation tax credits related to the property and uses the property for charitable, literary, scientific, cultural, or educational purposes.
Title
Real property tax exemption; certain leasehold interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103570D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1766 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)