VA SB1021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1021
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Kings Highway Bridge. Declares that the Kings Highway Bridge, located in the City of Suffolk, is eligible for state of good repair funds. The bill also directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board, the City of Suffolk, and members of the House of Delegates and Senate of Virginia representing the City of Suffolk to work together to identify potential funding sources for the replacement of the bridge.
Title
Kings Highway Bridge; located in the City of Suffolk, is eligible for state of good repair funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20105379D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105379D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1021 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)