VA SB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Animal Cruelty Conviction List established. Requires the Superintendent of State Police to establish within the Department of State Police by July 1, 2022, an Animal Cruelty Conviction List that is available to the public on the website of the Department of State Police. The list shall include the names of persons convicted on or after July 1, 2019, of a felony violation of the prohibition against cruelty to animals; animal fighting; maiming, killing, or poisoning an animal; or killing or injuring a police animal. The bill requires any person convicted of any such offense to pay a fee of $50 per conviction to fund the maintenance of the list. The bill requires the Department of State Police to maintain and regularly update the list and to remove a person from the list 15 years after his information is listed if the person has no additional felony conviction of a relevant animal cruelty offense.
Title
Animal Cruelty Conviction List; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100153D |