VA SB1004 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant law; early termination of rental agreements by victims of family abuse or sexual assault. Provides that a tenant who is a victim of (i) family abuse, (ii) sexual abuse, or (iii) criminal sexual assault may terminate a rental agreement under certain circumstances. The bill details the instance under which termination may be sought and the process that must be followed by the tenant to effect the termination.
Title
Landlord and tenant laws; early termination of rental agreements by victims of family abuse, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1004ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 13105155D-H1 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (88-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1004H1 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13105155D-H1 |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 13105155D-H1 |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1004S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104321D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104321D-S1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103378D |