VA SB100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
New sentencing hearing; abolition of parole. Provides that a person who was sentenced by a jury prior to the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104 (June 9, 2000), in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the abolition of parole, for a nonviolent felony committed after the time that the abolition of parole went into effect (January 1, 1995), is entitled to a new sentencing proceeding if such person is still incarcerated. The bill provides that such person shall file a petition for a new sentencing proceeding with the circuit court in which the order of conviction was originally entered. The circuit court shall empanel a new jury for the purpose of conducting the new sentencing proceeding and notify the appropriate attorney for the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that if the attorney for the Commonwealth and the person filing the petition agree, such person may waive his right to a new sentencing proceeding and allow the court to fix punishment.
Title
New sentencing hearing; abolition of parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100811D |