VA SB1 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Excise tax on peanuts. Extends from July 1, 2016, to July 1, 2021, the sunset of the $0.30 per 100 pounds excise tax on all peanuts grown in and sold in Virginia. The proceeds from the tax are used for promoting the sales and use of Virginia peanuts.
Title
Excise tax on peanuts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 23, 2016 | |
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/16/16 |
2016-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed House (91-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100290D |
Same As/Similar To
HB20 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)