VA SB1 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0656)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0656)
Summary
Civil remedial fees on certain drivers. Repeals ยง 46.2-206.1, which provides for the imposition of civil remedial fees on certain drivers.
Title
Civil remedial fees; repeals provision for those imposed on certain drivers.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Mark Herring [D] | Sen. Edward Houck [D] |
Sen. John Petersen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0656) | |
2008-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER) | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Conference: Emergency clause deleted by conference committee | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 086030293-S3 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Hugo, Athey, Melvin | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Reynolds, Houck, Petersen | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (35-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE #2 EMERGENCY (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (96-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080893244-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 080893244-H1 | |
2008-02-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-31 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Printed as reengrossed 085994244-E2S2 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reengrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1E2S2 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Amendment #4 by Senator Stolle agreed to | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Amendments #s 2,3,5,6 by Senator Stolle withdrawn | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 085994244-ES2 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1ES2 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Houck withdrawn | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Stolle provisions 2 & 3 rejected (17-Y 21-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Stolle provision 4 agreed to | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Pending question ordered (20-Y 18-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Finance Committee substitute agreed to 085994244-S2 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Courts of Justice Committee substitute rejected 080826244-S1 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 085994244-S2 | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080826244-S1 | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2007-11-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2007-11-19 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084418244 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB1 |