VA HR53 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending David and Eunjoo Anderson.
Title
Commending David and Eunjoo Anderson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2022-03-12 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed by until Sunday, March 13, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104786D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+sum+HR53 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+HR53+hil |