VA HR431 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House (HR431ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; free speech. Encourages public institutions of higher education to protect free speech and communicates the urgent need for the governing board of each public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to develop and adopt a policy on free speech that contains certain specifications relating to the institution's function and role with regard to public policy controversies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public institutions of higher education; free speech.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 31-N) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HouseBill text as passed House (HR431ER)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 31-N)
2017-02-22HouseAgreed to by House (64-Y 31-N)
2017-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HR431H1
2017-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105742D-H1
2017-02-22HouseTaken up
2017-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105742D-H1
2017-02-21HouseReported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-02-17HousePresented and ordered printed 17105581D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback