VA HJR88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education to study teacher licensing process; report. Requests the Department of Education to study the teacher licensure process and the assessment requirements therein for any inherent biases that may prevent minority teacher candidates from entering the profession.
Title
Teacher licensing process; Department of Education to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103840D |