VA HJR85 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Medical Assistance Services; feasibility of a spend down provision for the Community Living, Family and Individual Support, and Building Independence waivers; report. Requests the Department of Medical Assistance Services to study the feasibility of implementing a spend down provision for the Community Living, Family and Individual Support, and Building Independence waivers. The Department shall complete its work by November 30, 2022.
Title
Community Living, Family & Individual Support, and Building Independence waivers; DMAS to study, etc
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104040D |