VA HJR78 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Funeral; World War II Medal of Honor recipient. Memorializing the President of the United States to designate a single state funeral to be held upon the death of the last living Medal of Honor recipient from World War II.
Title
World War II Medal of Honor recipient; President to designate a single state funeral upon death.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reading waived |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-08 | House | Taken up |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100417D |