VA HJR764 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ764ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ764ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Appalachian Plastics, Inc.
Title
Commending Appalachian Plastics, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ764ER) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-29 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19103527D |