VA HJR76 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Rail and Public Transportation; Northern Virginia regional transit plan; report. Requests the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to study Northern Virginia regional transit and develop a regional transit plan that includes an extension of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority service to Prince William County and report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by November 1, 2022.
Title
Northern Virginia regional transit plan; Department of Rail and Public Transportation to study.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102347D |
Subjects
Authorities
Northern Virginia
Prince William County
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Transit Systems
Washington D.C. Metropolitan Area
Northern Virginia
Prince William County
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Transit Systems
Washington D.C. Metropolitan Area