VA HJR746 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ746ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ746ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Korean American veterans of the Vietnam War.
Title
Commending Korean American veterans of the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ746ER) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Received |
2013-01-18 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 13103392D |
2013-01-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13103392D |