VA HJR717 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ717ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ717ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Scott Blackford Meacham.
Title
Celebrating the life of Scott Blackford Meacham.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ717ER) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Received |
2023-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House |
2023-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-22 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed by until Wednesday, February 22, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 23104584D |