VA HJR703 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ703ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ703ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Trusted Choice Independent Insurance Agents Week. Designates the first full week of March, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as Trusted Choice Independent Insurance Agents Week.
Title
Trusted Choice? Independent Insurance Agents Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ703ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103732D |