VA HJR70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ70ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ70ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the life and legacy of Secretariat.
Title
Commemorating the life and legacy of Secretariat.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ70ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/08/20 20101812D |