VA HJR682 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Health Professions; utilization of foreign-trained physicians; report. Requests the Department of Health Professions to study options for utilizing physicians trained outside the United States to address shortages of physicians in rural and underserved areas of the Commonwealth.
Title
Health Professions, Department of; utilization of foreign-trained physicians, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104189D |