VA HJR676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); personal property tax exemption; motor vehicle of a veteran who is disabled. Provides that one motor vehicle of a veteran who has a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability shall be exempt from state and local taxes. The amendment provides that only automobiles and pickup trucks qualify for the exemption. Additionally, the exemption is only applicable on the date the motor vehicle is acquired or the effective date of the amendment, whichever is later, and is not applicable for any period of time prior to the effective date of the amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; personal property tax exemption for motor vehicle of a disabled veteran.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
2019-03-26HouseAssigned Chapter 822 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ676ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Reeves, DeSteph, Spruill
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Filler-Corn, Rush, O'Quinn
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106757D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenateAgreed to by Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ676S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106757D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateRead second time
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106757D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ676H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105924D-H1
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105924D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103340D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HJ676
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ676+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ676H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ676S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ676ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0822+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1804V0008+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0028+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2295+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0116+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0774HJ0676+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3087+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0865HJ0676+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3279+HJ0676
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1029HJ0676+HJ0676

Bill Comments

feedback