VA HJR675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education; experiential learning and workforce development opportunities in high-demand fields; report. Requests the Department of Education to study experiential learning and workforce development opportunities for high school students in high-demand fields.
Title
DOE; experiential learning and workforce development opportunities in high-demand fields, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103169D |