VA HJR656 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ656ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ656ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Spirit of '45 Day. Designates the second Sunday in August, in 2017 and in each succeeding year, as Spirit of '45 Day in Virginia.
Title
Spirit of '45 Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ656ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-24 | House | Taken up |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100164D |