VA HJR655 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ655ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance of lynching within the Commonwealth. Expresses the sentiment of the General Assembly in acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance of lynching within the Commonwealth and calling for reconciliation among all Virginians. This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission. This resolution is identical to SJ 297.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lynching; acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance within the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ655ER)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106504D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenateAgreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ655S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106504D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106504D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-01-31HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103777D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback