VA HJR635 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; insurance provisions of PPACA; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study the implementation of the insurance provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The joint subcommittee is directed to monitor the work of the Virginia Health Reform Initiative Council; monitor the actions of the State Corporation Commission in implementing the insurance provisions of PPACA; and make recommendations to appropriate public bodies regarding legislation necessary to implement such provisions of PPACA. The Commission must submit its report to the 2012 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
PPACA; Joint Commission on Health Care to study implementation of insurance provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ635H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104961D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104961D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100997D |