VA HJR63 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Madison County High School softball team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Madison County High School softball team.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-01-15SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-01-15SenateReceived
2018-01-12HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-01-12HouseEngrossed by House
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/18 18100139D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback