VA HJR623 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to study groundwater resources; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study Virginia's water resource planning and management, particularly with regard to groundwater. This study is a recommendation of the Joint Subcommittee to Formulate Recommendations to Address Recurrent Flooding.
Title
Water resource and planning management; JLARC to study Virginia's resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 7-N) (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 7-N) (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House (85-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ623H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104181D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-06 | House | Incorporates HJ595 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104181D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102202D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ595 (Similar To) 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules