VA HJR621 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; workforce development in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to update its 2014 review of workforce training in the Commonwealth with a new study of workforce development. In conducting its study, JLARC shall examine which entities in the Commonwealth are conducting workforce development activities, how much money is being spent on such activities, the sources of such money, which metrics can be used to determine the effects of spending on workforce development activities, and, based on those metrics, which entities in the Commonwealth are producing the best results.
Title
Workforce development in the Commonwealth; JLARC to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102408D |