VA HJR617 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ617ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Year of Reconciliation and Civility. Designates 2019 as the Year of Reconciliation and Civility in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Year of Reconciliation and Civility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ617ER)
2019-02-20SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-01-31HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101773D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback