VA HJR578 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializing Congress regarding the expansion of the Federal Trade Commission's rulemaking authority. Urges Congress to recognize the separation of powers principles established in the United States Constitution, acknowledges the importance of the Federal Trade Commission's streamlined rulemaking authority in limited circumstances, and encourages the United States Congress to refrain from expanding the Federal Trade Commission's streamlined rulemaking authority.
Title
Federal Trade Commission; urging Congress to refrain from granting expanded rulemaking authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N 2-A) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Senate: Left in Rules | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Agreed to by House (63-Y 33-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-31 | House: Taken up | |
2011-01-28 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103325D |