VA HJR571 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Owen Bradford Pickett.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Owen Bradford Pickett.

Sponsors

Del. Watkins Abbitt [I]Del. Robin Abbott [D]Del. David Albo [R]Sen. Kenneth Alexander [D]
Del. Richard Anderson [R]Del. Ward Armstrong [D]Del. Clifford Athey [R]Del. Mamye BaCote [D]
Del. William Barlow [D]Del. Richard Bell [R]Del. Robert Bell [R]Del. Robert Brink [D]
Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Kathy Byron [R]Del. Betsy Carr [D]Sen. Charles Carrico [R]
Del. William Cleaveland [R]Del. Benjamin Cline [R]Del. Mark Cole [R]Del. Barbara Comstock [R]
Sen. John Cosgrove [R]Del. John Cox [R]Del. Kirkland Cox [R]Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R]
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D]Sen. Adam Ebbin [D]Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. David Englin [D]
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Scott Garrett [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]Del. Thomas Greason [R]
Del. Gregory Habeeb [R]Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Patrick Hope [D]Del. Algie Howell [D]
Del. William Howell [R]Del. Timothy Hugo [R]Del. Sal Iaquinto [R]Del. Riley Ingram [R]
Del. Matthew James [D]Del. William Janis [R]Del. Johnny Joannou [D]Del. Joseph Johnson [D]
Del. Chris Jones [R]Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Terry Kilgore [R]Del. Barry Knight [R]
Del. Kaye Kory [D]Del. Steven Landes [R]Del. James LeMunyon [R]Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D]
Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R]Del. George Loupassi [R]Del. Daniel Marshall [R]Del. Robert Marshall [R]
Del. James Massie [R]Del. Joe May [R]Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D]Del. Delores McQuinn [D]
Del. Donald Merricks [R]Del. Jackson Miller [R]Del. Paula Miller [D]Del. James Morefield [R]
Del. Harvey Morgan [R]Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D]Del. David Nutter [R]Del. John O'Bannon [R]
Del. Glenn Oder [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]Del. Christopher Peace [R]Del. Clarence Phillips [D]
Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Brenda Pogge [R]Del. Charles Poindexter [R]Del. Albert Pollard [D]
Del. Harry Purkey [R]Del. Lacey Putney [I]Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Del. Thomas Rust [R]
Del. Edward Scott [R]Del. James Scott [D]Del. Beverly Sherwood [R]Del. James Shuler [D]
Del. Mark Sickles [D]Sen. Lionell Spruill [D]Del. Christopher Stolle [R]Sen. Scott Surovell [D]
Del. Robert Tata [R]Del. Luke Torian [D]Del. David Toscano [D]Del. Roslyn Tyler [D]
Del. Ron Villanueva [R]Del. Jeion Ward [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Onzlee Ware [D]
Del. Vivian Watts [D]Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-27 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
2011-01-27 Senate: Agreed to by Senate
2011-01-24 Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk
2011-01-24 Senate: Received
2011-01-21 House: Agreed to by House
2011-01-21 House: Engrossed by House
2011-01-14 House: Passed by for the day
2011-01-13 House: Introduced bill reprinted 11100758D
2011-01-10 House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/11 11100758D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback