VA HJR57 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.
Title
Constitutional amendment; fundamental right to marry, same-sex marriage prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100906D |