VA HJR561 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ561ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the 40th anniversary of Secretariat's Triple Crown triumph.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 40th anniversary of Secretariat's Triple Crown triumph.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ561ER)
2013-02-19SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2013-02-18SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2013-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2013-01-14SenateReading waived
2013-01-11HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2013-01-11HouseEngrossed by House
2013-01-02HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 13101804D
2012-12-03HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/13 13101804D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback