VA HJR55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Albemarle-Pamlico Watershed; report. Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the Albemarle-Pamlico Watershed in Virginia, including land use, stormwater, groundwater, storm information, and flora and fauna there.
Title
Albemarle-Pamlico Watershed in Virginia; Department of Environmental Quality to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102258D |