VA HJR538 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Access to water; human right. Recognizing that access to clean, potable, and affordable water is a necessary human right. Access to water; human right. Recognizing that access to clean, potable, and affordable water is a necessary human right.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to water; human right.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (61-Y 33-N) (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-27SenateReading waived
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Agree To (61-Y 33-N)
2021-01-26HouseAgreed to by House (61-Y 33-N)
2021-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 21101771D-E
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HJ538E
2021-01-26HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-26HouseTaken up
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules with amendment(s) (14-Y 4-N)
2021-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101771D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback