VA HJR535 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Technology and Science; extreme differences in life expectancy; use of technology for monitoring and resolving. Directs the Joint Commission on Technology and Science (Commission) to study potential technological approaches to monitoring and resolving extreme differences in life expectancy in Virginia, including by examining (i) data sources for life expectancy variation, drivers of such variation, and technological solutions for monitoring efforts to reduce variation; (ii) technological and policy solutions for areas that are most affected; (iii) remedies, mitigation, and their cost; (iv) the degree of certainty that exists regarding data on impacts on life expectancy and alternative actions; and (v) necessary technical resources and their cost. The bill directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to provide technical assistance to the Commission and directs the Commission to accept scientific and technical assistance provided by the Virginia Academy of Science, Engineering, and Medicine.
Title
Life expectancy; Joint Commission on Technology and Science to study differences in Virginia, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Rules |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102995D |