VA HJR5008 | 2014 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ5008ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ5008ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Armand James DeBellis.
Title
Celebrating the life of Armand James DeBellis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ5008ER) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14200066D |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-25 | House | Agreed to by House |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-03-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14200066D |