VA HJR452 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Introduced bill reprinted 12105150D
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Saving Sweet Briar, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Saving Sweet Briar, Inc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 12105150D
2016-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ452ER)
2016-03-10SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2016-03-08SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2016-03-08SenateReceived
2016-03-08HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed by House
2016-03-04HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 16105455D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback