VA HJR425 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ425ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ425ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day. Designates June 27, in 2016 and in each succeeding year, as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day in Virginia.
Title
Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ425ER) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-03-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-03-10 | House | Taken up |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16105953D |
2016-03-03 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |