VA HJR415 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the United States Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutters Service.
Title
Commending the United States Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutters Service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-21 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105503D | |
2012-02-20 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105503D |