VA HJR415 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of E. George Middleton, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of E. George Middleton, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Received | |
2010-03-10 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2010-03-10 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10105744D | |
2010-03-05 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10105744D |