VA HJR4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ4ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ4ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Alan Arnold Diamonstein.
Title
Celebrating the life of Alan Arnold Diamonstein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ4ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-18 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 16, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-13 | House | Passed by until January 21, 2020 |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/08/20 20101255D |