VA HJR4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; local license tax business classifications and tax rates; report. Directs the Department of Taxation to study the local license tax business classifications and tax rates. The Department is to complete its work by November 30, 2012.
Title
License tax business classifications and tax rates, local; Department of Taxation to study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Rules | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2011-12-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-12-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100121D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HJ4 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HJ4+hil |