VA HJR39 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Board of Pharmacy; kratom; report. Directs the Board of Pharmacy to study whether Mitragyna speciosa, commonly known as kratom, should be classified as a controlled substance in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kratom; Board of Pharmacy to study whether it should be classified as a controlled substance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Rules
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103467D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback