VA HJR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; adult abuse in the Commonwealth; report. Requests the Department of Social Services (DSS) to research the frequency and character of adult abuse allegations in the Commonwealth, compare the Commonwealth's statistics to national standards, and recommend strategies to prevent and raise awareness about adult abuse in the Commonwealth.
Title
Adult abuse; Department of Social Services to study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102727D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ39 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ39+hil |