VA HJR361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Washington-Liberty High School International Baccalaureate program.
Title
Commending the Washington-Liberty High School International Baccalaureate program.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106351D |