VA HJR35 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; reforms to the Commonwealth's private health insurance system; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee on Healthcare Reform to recommend reforms to the Commonwealth's private health insurance system. The joint subcommittee is directed to identify strategies to reduce the rate of increases in the cost of health insurance and related products through mechanisms that allow Virginians to exercise greater control over decisions involving expenditures on health insurance and other aspects of health care. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall examine (i) the need to improve health insurance literacy; (ii) the feasibility of implementing a health insurance exchange; (iii) measures to increase transparency within the health care and health insurance systems; (iv) options to increase the level of competition and decrease market concentration among health insurers in the Commonwealth; (v) the advisability of requiring health insurers and providers to disclose certain changes to provider agreements; (vi) ways to increase the use by Virginia's health insurers of uniform forms; (vii) the rate by which Virginia's health insurers are implementing recent legislative initiatives that sought to make health insurance more affordable for small employers and more accessible to their employees; (viii) the desirability of amending Virginia's health insurance laws in response to federal health care reform legislation; and (ix) the potential benefits and detriments of the Commonwealth's opting out of including a federally sponsored health plan in a health insurance exchange or market, if federal legislation provides states with such an option.
Title
Health insurance system, private; joint subcommittee on Healthcare Reform to recommend reforms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100408D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HJ35 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HJ35+hil |