VA HJR304 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Pablo Cuevas.
Title
Commending Pablo Cuevas.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Chris Runion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20106478D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HJ304 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HJ304+hil |