VA HJR30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Victims of Communism Memorial Day. Designating November 7, in 2018 and in each succeeding year, as Victims of Communism Memorial Day in Virginia.
Title
Victims of Communism Memorial Day; designating as Nov. 7, 2018, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101113D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ30E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101113D |