VA HJR298 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Helen Burnett Shields.
Title
Commending Helen Burnett Shields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-03 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12104683D | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-01 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12104683D |